Title |
Name |
Attendance in Person (B) |
By Proxy |
Required Attendances (A) |
Attendance Rate in Person(%)(B/A) |
Remarks |
Chairman |
Cheng-Mount Cheng
(Corporate Representative of the MOTC) |
22 |
2 |
24 |
92% |
Inaugurated as director as corporate representative of the NDF between August 17, 2018 and September 30, 2020. Inaugurated as director as corporate representative of the MOTC and elected as chairman since October 1, 2020. |
Former Chairman |
Chih-Chien Hsieh
(Corporate Representative of the MOTC) |
19 |
0 |
29 |
95% |
Inaugurated as director and elected as chairman on June 23, 2016. Stepped down as chairman on September 30, 2020 and retired on October 1, 2020. 1 leave of absence. |
Director |
Kun-Ching Liao
(Corporate Representative of the MOTC) |
26 |
0 |
26 |
100% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. |
Director |
Ping-Jen Tseng
(Corporate Representative of the MOTC) |
26 |
0 |
26 |
100% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2016. |
Director |
Keh-Her Shih
(Corporate Representative of the NDF) |
3 |
2 |
5 |
60% |
Inaugurated as director on December 21, 2020. |
Director |
Shao-Yuan Chang
(Corporate Representative of the NDF) |
20 |
1 |
21 |
95% |
Inaugurated as director on April 29, 2019. |
Director |
Chien-Yi Chang
(Corporate Representative of the NDF) |
17 |
9 |
26 |
65% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. |
Director |
Shao-Liang Chen
(Corporate Representative of the TIPC) |
15 |
3 |
19 |
79% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. Stepped down as director on June 17, 2019. Inaugurated as director on May 5, 2020. |
Director |
Wen-Ching Liu
(Corporate Representative of the TNC) |
25 |
1 |
26 |
96% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. |
Former Director |
Jiunn-Rong Chiou
(Corporate Representative of the NDF) |
1 |
1 |
2 |
50% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. Stepped down as director on September 17, 2018. |
Former Director |
Chuan-Te Ho
(Corporate Representative of the NDF) |
5 |
0 |
5 |
100% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. Stepped down as director on April 29, 2019. |
Independent Director |
Tar-Shing Tang |
26 |
0 |
26 |
100% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. |
Independent Director |
Tze-Chun Wang |
26 |
0 |
26 |
100% |
New office assumed on June 22, 2018. |
Independent Director |
Jei-Fuu Chen |
10 |
0 |
10 |
100% |
Elected to fill the vacancy as independent director on June 17, 2020. |
Former Independent Director |
Ming-Sheu Tsai |
12 |
0 |
13 |
92% |
Elected to fill the vacancy as independent director on June 22, 2017. Renewal of office on June 22, 2018. Resigned on April 16, 2020. 1 leave of absence. |